Accounts and annual returns GLENDEE RESCUE LTD

Charity number: 1171888
Charity reporting is overdue by 279 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 279 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 279 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 29 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 07 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 29 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 22 October 2019 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 22 October 2019 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window