Trustees UNIVERSITY OF DERBY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1169283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Carl Hughes Chair 15 June 2018
None on record
Owen Viana Marques Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Joseph Samuel Webster Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
NINA CUPRIC Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
ANTHONY ATHERTON DAVID Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
NICOLA HARTLEY Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
Mr M Spencer Trustee 16 January 2018
None on record