Accounts and annual returns PUBLIC HEALTH COLLABORATION

Charity number: 1171887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 06 February 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 06 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 08 February 2019 3 days late Download Open in new window