MELTHAM CARLILE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On behalf of the residents of the Township of Meltham, the Trustees of this charity maintain and manage the Carlile Institute in Meltham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 14 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL GRENVILLE WHITE | Chair | 07 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Patricia O'Brien | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Ann Jurczyszyn | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM LAMB | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR JEAN WRATHALL | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS Kate Buchanan | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ROGER GREAVES | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JORDAN NOON | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.38k | £89.77k | £81.43k | £48.07k | £46.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.89k | £56.23k | £40.49k | £37.52k | £44.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £51.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- (1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MELTHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (2) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: (I) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meltham Carlile Ltd
The Carlile Institute
Huddersfield Road
Meltham
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 4AG
- Phone:
- 07706678730
- Email:
- hello@carlileinstitute.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window