Accounts and annual returns WEST KIRBY DISTRICT GUIDES

Charity number: 508760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required