Financial history WEST KIRBY DISTRICT GUIDES

Charity number: 508760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.58k £2.89k £4.31k £12.81k £1.02k
Total expenditure £4.39k £4.37k £4.82k £3.32k £4.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A