Trustees ST OSYTH PRIORY & PARISH TRUST

Charity number: 1170037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Robin Grinsted Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
David William Ronald Harrington Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Martin Charles Walsh Trustee 19 April 2021
ST. OSYTH HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Julia Kay Smith Trustee 04 November 2019
None on record
Andrew Armstrong Booth Trustee 02 August 2018
None on record
Sonia Wendy Grantham Trustee 02 August 2018
None on record
CONRAD PAYNE Trustee 07 September 2016
None on record
TIMOTHY ROBERT SARGEANT Trustee 07 September 2016
None on record