AIREDALE VOLUNTARY DRUG AND ALCOHOL AGENCY LIMITED

Charity number: 1173006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download