Financial history AIREDALE VOLUNTARY DRUG AND ALCOHOL AGENCY LIMITED

Charity number: 1173006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.40m £1.71m £2.19m £2.16m £1.95m
Total expenditure £1.34m £1.69m £1.98m £1.86m £2.17m
Income from government contracts £291.96k £361.26k £371.96k £688.74k £771.65k
Income from government grants £558.77k £96.84k £134.55k N/A £873.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £88.49k £63.53k £56.81k £277.27k £61.57k
Income - Other trading activities £96.35k £88.53k £100.33k £76.53k £77.55k
Income - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.56m £2.03m £1.81m £1.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £258 £267 £430 £1.40k £1.99k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.34m £1.69m £1.98m £1.84m £2.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £379 £624 £11.41k £177
Expenditure - Governance £8.82k £9.65k £7.78k £8.29k £11.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.17k £0 £0 £0 £0