CRANK WI

Charity number: 1171179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 March 2021 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required