ST OMERS TRUST

Charity number: 508771
Charity reporting is overdue by 1634 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £31.30k £21.16k £18.45k £12.67k £16.47k
Total expenditure £35.25k £30.37k £27.14k £21.49k £14.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A