GATESHEAD KESTRELS (DISABILITY SPORTS CLUB)

Charity number: 1169221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 March 2020 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 March 2020 254 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 August 2018 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 28 September 2018 90 days late Download