Financial history HOUSE OF WORSHIP CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1169488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £67.84k £70.44k £63.31k £43.73k £84.03k
Total expenditure £59.48k £72.48k £61.58k £33.32k £64.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A