Financial history WYCOMBE ISLAMIC MISSION AND MOSQUE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1169492
Charity reporting is up to date (134 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £538.72k £630.35k £791.38k £786.86k £759.28k
Total expenditure £538.63k £584.71k £596.10k £544.83k £593.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £155.79k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £487.07k £472.80k £637.34k £535.83k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £157.54k £0 £0 £661.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £50.65k £0 £154.04k £95.23k £97.86k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £155.79k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £415.90k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.57k £168.81k £105.52k £149.74k £156.70k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £24.49k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £32.15k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £125.64k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £521.06k £0 £490.59k £395.10k £436.70k