Accounts and annual returns JMWM HUSSAIN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window