Financial history VIVEKANANDA HUMAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1170716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £16.48k £19.88k £18.98k £13.27k £7.16k
Total expenditure £17.18k £22.72k £18.33k £10.17k £9.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A