BUSY BODS AT YSGOL BODFARI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of childcare - Playgroup, After School Club and Holiday Club for children aged 2 to 12 within a school setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £3,849 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 24 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER LOUISE WILLIAMS | Chair | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Threlfall | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Roberts | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DICK | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|||||
ANNE DENISE HAYDOCK | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.40k | £24.92k | £33.61k | £49.55k | £52.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.69k | £21.05k | £34.34k | £36.23k | £56.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.06k | £10.35k | £3.84k | £14.07k | £3.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2016 as amended on 19 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL AND PRIMARY SCHOOL AGE PUPILS AT BUSY BODS AT YSGOL BODFARI BY PROVIDING PLAYGROUP, AFTER-SCHOOL AND HOLIDAY CARE IN PARTICULAR TO PREPARE PRE-SCHOOL AND NURSERY CHILDREN IN AND AROUND BODFARI IN DENBIGHSHIRE WITH THE BASIC NUMERACY, LITERACY AND SOCIAL SKILLS NEEDED TO PREPARE THEM FOR ENTRY INTO THE FOUNDATION PHASE. TO PROVIDE A FACILITY FOR CHILDREN WHO LIVE IN AN ISOLATED, RURAL AREA WHO LIVE AWAY FROM THE LEISURE FACILITIES OF URBAN AREAS, TO HAVE ACCESS TO STRUCTURED AND UNSTRUCTURED PLAY ACTIVITIES AND TO SOCIALISE AND DEVELOP FRIENDSHIP GROUPS. IN ADDITION TO PROVIDE AFTER-SCHOOL AND HOLIDAY CARE FOR CHILDREN FROM 3 YEARS OF AGE TO 12 YEARS OF AGE, IN AND AROUND BODFARI IN DENBIGHSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO PROVIDE PHYSICAL EDUCATION IN THE FORM OF INDOOR AND OUTDOOR GAMES, AN AWARENESS OF GROWING AND COOKING HEALTHY FOOD, ART AND CRAFT ACTIVITIES AND ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE THINKING SKILLS. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN OF PRE-SCHOOL AND PRIMARY AGED CHILDREN IN THE AREA, AND TO STRENGTHEN COMMUNITY LINKS IN A RURAL AREA, BY PROVIDING A WRAP-ROUND CARE FACILITY FOR CHILDREN TO ENABLE PARENTS / CARERS TO ACCESS CHILDCARE PROVISION CLOSE TO HOME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Bodfari
Bodfari
DENBIGH
LL16 4DA
- Phone:
- 01745710329
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window