Trustees KHOJA SHIA ITHNA-ASHERI MUSLIM COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Charity number: 1170675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSLIM KHOJA | Chair | 18 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Hussein Elias | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Hasnain Asaria | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
SHAN - E- ABBAS SADIK HASSANALI HASSAM | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rizwan Haiderali Alidina | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
RIDHWAN ABDULHUSSEIN HAMER | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
FATEMA AARIFHUSSEIN DAMJI | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
HUSNA KHIMJI | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Irfan Husein Mohamedraza Janmohamed | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
FATIM RIYAZ BANDALI | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Mubarakali Nisarhussein Janmohamed | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Hussein Jaffer | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tawfiqali Hussein Kassamali Jivraj | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ISMAT ANIS AKBERALI RAMJI | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
MOHAMED ARIF RIZWAN RAILEY | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Hasnain Gulamabbas Abdulrasul Bandali | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.