Financial history BAREFOOT COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1171643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £87.04k £154.99k £175.09k £114.17k £101.21k
Total expenditure £49.57k £68.15k £150.25k £175.80k £156.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A