BAR HILL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bar Hill Church provides facilities and leadership for Christian worship and many community activities within the village of Bar Hill and surrounding area. It provides pastoral, emotional and practical support to members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,350 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 15 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Wendy Wale | Chair | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Pryke | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hilson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Chappell | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joy Vendy | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lucy Wright | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Horne | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Spence | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Leslie Cox | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Chappell | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elizabeth Bennett | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Tod | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ingle | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.75k | £133.53k | £139.26k | £166.40k | £148.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.18k | £107.99k | £122.71k | £136.98k | £119.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.11k | £670 | £2.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUL 2016 as amended on 12 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAR HILL CHURCH
HANOVER CLOSE
BAR HILL
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 8EH
- Phone:
- 01954206120
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window