ST MARK'S PARISH CHURCH REPAIR FUND

Charity number: 508870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 November 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 November 2016 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required