WORTH VALLEY YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 508871
Charity reporting is overdue by 1180 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 January 2020 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1180 days
Annual return 31 August 2016 18 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required