Accounts and annual returns MAKE A DIFFERENCE SCHOOLS - MOMBASA

Charity number: 1170814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required