LONDON WELSH MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by promoting artistic activities and performing as part of such activities, particularly performing works composed and/or written by those of Welsh origin and/or in the Welsh language (Welsh Works). To promote public education and training in choral music, particularly in Welsh works.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2016: CIO registration
- 25 September 2018: Funds received from 262647 LONDON WELSH MALE VOICE CHOIR
- COR MEIBION CYMRY LLUNDAIN (Working name)
- LWMVC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hywel Watkins | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Williams | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Harry Rees | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Norman Leslie Les | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Philip Spenser Griffith | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jonathan Snowdon | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eryl Vaughan Davies | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alun Edwards | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GLYN JONES | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 18 May 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.64k | £12.07k | £19.18k | £55.52k | £51.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.11k | £30.22k | £39.33k | £49.16k | £52.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Dec 2016 as amended on 13 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC IN SUCH CHARITABLE MANNER AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE, AND IN PARTICULAR: A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING ARTISTIC ACTIVITIES AND PERFORMING AS PART OF SUCH ACTIVITIES, PARTICULARLY PERFORMING WORKS COMPOSED AND/OR WRITTEN BY THOSE OF WELSH ORIGIN AND/OR IN THE WELSH LANGUAGE (WELSH WORKS). B) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN CHORAL MUSIC, PARTICULARLY IN WELSH WORKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Welsh Centre
157-163 Gray's Inn Road
LONDON
WC1X 8UE
- Phone:
- 02078373722
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window