Accounts and annual returns LON Y BUGAIL TRUST

Charity number: 1172894
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 09 July 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 July 2024 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 20 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 July 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 July 2020 64 days late Download Open in new window