Accounts and annual returns FAIZ PUR SHARIF UNION COUNCIL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1171508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 12 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 25 February 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 25 February 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 26 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 26 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 14 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window