MUSLIM SCHOOL OADBY

Charity number: 1171280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 June 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 June 2019 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 20 May 2019 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 19 May 2019 353 days late Download