TADCASTER FLOOD ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve life and property in the event of flooding in Tadcaster. To help and provide assistance to the community in becoming resilient to flooding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA EADES | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ALLEN | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL BEWLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.35k | £12.00k | £12.00k | £12.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £638 | £2.30k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE PRESERVATION OF HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY AND FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT TO PROVIDE, PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, RESTORE, AND/OR IMPROVE FLOOD DEFENCES AND FLOOD PROTECTION MEASURES AND FLOOD DAMAGE REMEDIATION IN THE AREA OF TADCASTER, NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIDGE STREET DENTAL CARE
22 BRIDGE STREET
TADCASTER
LS24 9AL
- Phone:
- 01937833416
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window