ADDENBROOKE'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1170103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM PHILIP FOX Trustee 04 August 2020 None on record
JAMES STEVENS Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
DR HUGO EDWARD RAWLINSON FORD Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
Dr FIONA ELIZABETH CORNISH Trustee 03 April 2017
THE MICHAELHOUSE CENTRE CAMBRIDGE LIMITED Received: 17 days late
THE PARAGON TRUST Received: On time
MEDICAL SUPPORT IN ROMANIA Received: On time
CLAIRE LOUISE SMITH Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
DR MIKE KNAPTON Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
JOHN ROBERT AYTON Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
MR CHRIS REES Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
KEITH MARTIN WADE Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR HELEN ST CLAIRE HOWE Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
DR ROS SMITH Chair 03 April 2017
THE LANCASTER-TAYLOR CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Christopher Mark Hutton Walkinshaw Trustee 03 April 2017
SIR MICHAEL MARSHALL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
SIMON JOE THORLEY Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record