Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID, BRAYTON
Charity number: 1169956

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Anne Griffiths | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ruth Beevers | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Murray | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Diane Drake | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Finlinson | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Anne Grace Croft | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Boyer | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Christine Putman | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Graham Pearson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Bunn | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUTH CHRISTINE BREEZE | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE JACKMAN | Trustee | 01 November 1986 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.