Accounts and annual returns LGBT+ NETWORK FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1171911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 January 2022 28 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2022 28 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 January 2021 21 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2021 21 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 January 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2020 26 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 January 2019 19 January 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2019 19 January 2020 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 January 2018 30 January 2019 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2018 30 January 2019 61 days late Download Open in new window