PETERBOROUGH FARM MACHINERY PRESERVATION SOCIETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Displaying historic machinery and organising working demonstrations at several shows attended by the general public. Providing an exhibition trailer as a display / meeting point.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 November 2016: CIO registration
- 09 February 2017: Funds received from 278480 THE PETERBOROUGH FARM MACHINERY PRESERVATION SOCIE...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick James Nightingale | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Thomas Granger | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian David Lutkin | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY FISHER | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE KNIGHT | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £1.35k | £11.33k | £9.06k | £11.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.33k | £2.55k | £5.85k | £9.83k | £11.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY BY PROCURING, MAINTAINING, RECORDING AND EXHIBITING AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY, EQUIPMENT THAT IS OF HISTORIC INTEREST AND VALUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Charles Road
Whittlesey
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 2RG
- Phone:
- 07912066269
- Email:
- pfmpssecretary@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window