THE ROTARY CLUBS OF ST ALBANS CHARITY CYCLE RIDE

Charity number: 1169651
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 06 September 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 06 September 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 19 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 08 August 2018 On time Download