We Are Purposeful

Charity number: 1169844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 July 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 July 2020 28 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time Download