BAYT AL QAIM ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide religious education in Islam, arrange social & burial services, provide for the poor, promote & advance interfaith dialogue, establish & maintain Mosque, encourage the practice of the Islamic religion as taught by Shia Ithna-Asheri Sharia among the Shia community, hold and arrange Islamic ceremonies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 February 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHERAZ HUSSAIN SHAH | Chair | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SYED NISAR HUSSAIN NAQVI | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DANYAL NAQVI | Trustee | 12 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.36k | £98.17k | £110.10k | £102.33k | £109.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.60k | £38.34k | £82.02k | £72.85k | £99.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BAYT AL QAIM ARE:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE SHIA ITHNA-ASHERI JAFERI FAITH AS NARRATED AND INTERPRETED BY THE HOLY PROPHET MOHAMMED (PBUH & HP) AND THE IMAMS OF AHLUL BAYT (PBUT).
Contact information
- Address:
-
M A RIZVI LTD
353A GREAT HORTON ROAD
BRADFORD
BD7 3BZ
- Phone:
- 01274424453
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window