Accounts and annual returns THE HANOVER TRUST

Charity number: 1170446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 November 2019 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1427 days