LIFEBRIDGE ASEND

Charity number: 1172089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 April 2019 On time Download