LEWISHAM MUSIC

Charity number: 1169721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Kiruta-Kigozi Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Lydia Brookes Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
Fiona Lambert Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Louise Alexander Trustee 13 February 2020
THE WYCOMBE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE LTD Received: On time
Susannah Lucy York Skinner Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
CLLR Chris Barnham Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
Audrey Bleazard Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Dame Joan Ruddock Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record