ALCESTER MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1169799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required