GREENWAY ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1170205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.00k £11.66k £12.13k £7.06k £2.26k
Total expenditure £10.29k £7.53k £8.29k £123 £13.24k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A