THE ACNE AND ROSACEA ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1170710
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 508 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download