Financial history LLANDAFF CITY BOWMEN

Charity number: 1169666
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £32.05k £18.06k £20.85k £19.59k £9.27k
Total expenditure £29.50k £18.84k £28.90k £20.81k £9.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k N/A N/A £16.50k N/A