ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT VISITORS AND CONSULTANTS TO CHILDCARE SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate throughout England and Wales. We raise standards, awareness and impact of Regulation 44 and Independent consultancy on children and young people in care and leaving care. Activities include training and education, conferences, influencing and contributing to policy and practice development, setting standards. Involving service providers and young people in the development of Reg44
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 2017: CIO registration
- AIVCCS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERYL CARTER CQSW PQD | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Bryan | Trustee | 08 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anthia Rainford-Butler | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Moses | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN DANIEL | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LAILA MORGAN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £3.37k | £80 | £4.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.79k | £764 | £3.43k | £2.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 April 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 April 2022 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: WITH RESPECT TO ITS PURPOSE AND PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH, AND WELLBEING, TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LOOKED AFTER IN ENGLAND AND WALES THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE KNOWLEDGE STANDARDS AND IMPACT OF INDEPENDENT VISITORS, WHO ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE MONITORING AND MAKING RECOMMENDATIONS FOR IMPROVING OF THE SERVICE THEY RECEIVE, VISITING AND REPORTING ON CHILDREN’S HOMES ON A MONTHLY BASIS UNANNOUNCED AND ANNOUNCED AND BY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: • BY INFORMING AND RAISING AWARENESS INCLUDING 1. IN GAPS IN PRACTICE AND SERVICE FOR LAC (LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN) 2. THE ROLE AND RESPONSIBILITY OF THE INDEPENDENT VISITOR • BY MONITORING, EVALUATING AND PRESENTING THE OUTCOMES OF THESE WHERE TO DO SO FURTHERS THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY • BY INCREASING THE IMPACT OF INDEPENDENT VISITORS AND CONSULTANTS IN THE REALM OF POLICY MAKING FOR LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN • BY PROMOTING EXCELLENT STANDARDS OF INDEPENDENT VISITING AND CONSULTATION FOR LOOKED AFTER SERVICES THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND SHARING OF BEST PRACTICE GUIDANCE, CODE OF PRACTICE AND TRAINING AND SUPPORT ALL WITH THE AIM OF INCREASING THE CHILDREN’S AND YOUNG PEOPLE’S HEALTH AND WELLBEING, THEIR CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS, UNDERSTANDING AND THEIR ATTAINMENT LEVELS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 ARDENT CLOSE
LONDON
SE25 6SR
- Phone:
- 03330124286
- Email:
- office@aivccs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window