ANSAAR COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1171225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 July 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 July 2019 05 April 2021 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 July 2018 05 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 July 2018 Not Required