FEED THE HOMELESS

Charity number: 1169924
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 11 September 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 11 September 2020 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 14 October 2019 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 14 October 2019 44 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download