YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1173368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 12 June 2020 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 12 June 2020 73 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 12 June 2020 439 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 12 June 2020 439 days late
Annual return 31 May 2017 29 May 2020 790 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required