Accounts and annual returns THE ALAN FLETCHER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1170939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2022 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 April 2022 179 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 February 2021 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1303 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 February 2020 104 days late Download Open in new window