WORCESTERSHIRE EARLY MUSIC

Charity number: 1170552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 04 January 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 14 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required