ST GILES HOSPICE

Charity number: 509014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Valerie Jones Trustee 04 November 2021
STAFFORD AND CANNOCK LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS Received: On time
Robin Vickers Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Paul Jennings Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Dr Catherine Finn Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
STEPHEN JOHN RIDLER Trustee 18 October 2016 None on record
ROBERT ANDREW DONALD Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
LINDSEY WILLIAMS Trustee 04 March 2015 None on record
Simon James Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record