IMMANUEL CHURCH BRENTFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Immanuel Church Brentford is an evangelical and Presbyterian congregation in Brentford West London. The church seeks to spread the Christian faith by offering weekly services of worship, clubs for children, Bible studies, and working with other local charities to relieve poverty and financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD LINNELL | Chair | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Todd Crusey | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CLARK | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Fox | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.05k | £81.43k | £95.47k | £80.06k | £81.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.64k | £69.29k | £111.22k | £70.02k | £48.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 25 OCT 2016 AMENDED ON 28 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF PRESBYTERIAN BELIEF AND PRACTICES IN SCHEDULE 1 IN BRENTFORD, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR PARTS OF THE WORLD THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF WORSHIP AND PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN BRENTFORD, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR PARTS OF THE WORLD THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY PROVIDING: FUNDS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 York Road
BRENTFORD
Middlesex
TW8 0QP
- Phone:
- 07413500774
- Email:
- immanuelbrentford@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window